Pages

Monday, 11 September 2017

Multiplication pyramid

5 x 15 =75
5 x 10 = 50
5 x 5 = 25
50 + 25 = 75

15 x 12 = 180
12 x 10 = 120
12 x 5 = 60
120 + 60 = 180


12 x 4 = 48
10 x 4 = 40
2 x 4 = 8
40 + 8 = 48

75 x 180 =
70 x 100 = 7000
70 x 80 = 5600
5 x 100 = 500
5 x 80 = 400
7000 + 5600 = 12600
500 + 400 = 900
12600 + 900 = 13500

180 x 48 =
40 x 100 = 4000
40 x 80 = 3200
8 x 100 = 800
8 x 80 = 640
4000 + 3200 = 7200
800 + 640 = 1440
7200 + 1440 = 8640

13500 x 8640 =
8640 x 10000 = 86400000
8640 x 3000 =25920000
8640 x 500 = 4320000
86400000 + 25920000 + 4320000 = 116640000

1 comment:

  1. Hi agnels

    I see your good at your maths keep up the good work:)

    ReplyDelete